E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/24/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5764 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3102 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5036 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5399 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4614 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2611 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2854 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#705 | Journal Page: 2853 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2853 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2853 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/4/11 2:40 PM | Journal Page: 2845 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2845 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2776 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2776 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2776 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |