Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2374 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2374 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2322 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 3962 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3778 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3778 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3778 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1061 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |