E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4013 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5957 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5964 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5392 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3363 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3363 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3363 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3362 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3362 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3362 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3362 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2304 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3866 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3841 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3841 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3177 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Filed |