E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 169
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR169
|
Journal Page: 5744
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5395
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3963
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3806
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3806
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3806
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#218
|
Journal Page: 1262
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1262
|