1 | 1 | | By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3840 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the extension of the deadline for holding the |
---|
11 | 11 | | confirmation and initial directors' election of the Tradition |
---|
12 | 12 | | Municipal Utility District No. 2 of Denton County. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 8189.003, Special District Local Laws |
---|
15 | 15 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 8189.003. CONFIRMATION ELECTION REQUIRED. If the |
---|
17 | 17 | | creation of the district is not confirmed at a confirmation |
---|
18 | 18 | | election held under Section 8189.024 before September 1, 2015 |
---|
19 | 19 | | [2011]: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) the district is dissolved September 1, 2015 |
---|
21 | 21 | | [2011], except that: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (A) any debts incurred shall be paid; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (B) any assets that remain after the payment of |
---|
24 | 24 | | debts shall be transferred to Denton County; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (C) the organization of the district shall be |
---|
26 | 26 | | maintained until all debts are paid and remaining assets are |
---|
27 | 27 | | transferred; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) this chapter expires September 1, 2018 [2014]. |
---|
29 | 29 | | SECTION 2. Section 8189.021, Special District Local Laws |
---|
30 | 30 | | Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections |
---|
31 | 31 | | (e) and (f) to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (d) Temporary directors serve until the earlier of: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) the date initial directors are elected under |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 8189.024; or |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) the fourth anniversary of the date on which the |
---|
36 | 36 | | temporary directors were appointed [date this subchapter expires |
---|
37 | 37 | | under Section 8189.026]. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) If initial directors have not been elected under Section |
---|
39 | 39 | | 8189.024 and the terms of the temporary directors have expired, |
---|
40 | 40 | | successor temporary directors shall be appointed or reappointed as |
---|
41 | 41 | | provided by Subsection (f) to serve terms that expire on the |
---|
42 | 42 | | earliest of: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) the date initial directors are elected under |
---|
44 | 44 | | Section 8189.024; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) the fourth anniversary of the date of the |
---|
46 | 46 | | appointment or reappointment; or |
---|
47 | 47 | | (3) the date this chapter expires under Section |
---|
48 | 48 | | 8189.003. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (f) If Subsection (e) applies, the owner or owners of a |
---|
50 | 50 | | majority of the assessed value of the real property in the district |
---|
51 | 51 | | may submit a petition to the Texas Commission on Environmental |
---|
52 | 52 | | Quality requesting that the commission appoint as successor |
---|
53 | 53 | | temporary directors the five persons named in the petition. The |
---|
54 | 54 | | commission shall appoint as successor temporary directors the five |
---|
55 | 55 | | persons named in the petition. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 3. Section 8189.026, Special District Local Laws |
---|
57 | 57 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sec. 8189.026. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
59 | 59 | | expires September 1, 2018 [2014]. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
61 | 61 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
62 | 62 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
63 | 63 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
64 | 64 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
65 | 65 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
66 | 66 | | Government Code. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
68 | 68 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
69 | 69 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
71 | 71 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
72 | 72 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
73 | 73 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
75 | 75 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
76 | 76 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
77 | 77 | | and accomplished. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
79 | 79 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
80 | 80 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
81 | 81 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
82 | 82 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
83 | 83 | | * * * * * |
---|