Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3840 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3840
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2011;
 May 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of the deadline for holding the
 confirmation and initial directors' election of the Tradition
 Municipal Utility District No. 2 of Denton County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8189.003, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8189.003.  CONFIRMATION ELECTION REQUIRED.  If the
 creation of the district is not confirmed at a confirmation
 election held under Section 8189.024 before September 1, 2015
 [2011]:
 (1)  the district is dissolved September 1, 2015
 [2011], except that:
 (A)  any debts incurred shall be paid;
 (B)  any assets that remain after the payment of
 debts shall be transferred to Denton County; and
 (C)  the organization of the district shall be
 maintained until all debts are paid and remaining assets are
 transferred; and
 (2)  this chapter expires September 1, 2018 [2014].
 SECTION 2.  Section 8189.021, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections
 (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  Temporary directors serve until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date initial directors are elected under
 Section 8189.024; or
 (2)  the fourth anniversary of the date on which the
 temporary directors were appointed [date this subchapter expires
 under Section 8189.026].
 (e)  If initial directors have not been elected under Section
 8189.024 and the terms of the temporary directors have expired,
 successor temporary directors shall be appointed or reappointed as
 provided by Subsection (f) to serve terms that expire on the
 earliest of:
 (1)  the date initial directors are elected under
 Section 8189.024;
 (2)  the fourth anniversary of the date of the
 appointment or reappointment; or
 (3)  the date this chapter expires under Section
 8189.003.
 (f)  If Subsection (e) applies, the owner or owners of a
 majority of the assessed value of the real property in the district
 may submit a petition to the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality requesting that the commission appoint as successor
 temporary directors the five persons named in the petition. The
 commission shall appoint as successor temporary directors the five
 persons named in the petition.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8189.026, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8189.026.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER.  This subchapter
 expires September 1, 2018 [2014].
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *