Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|