E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4340 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6284 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5758 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2710 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2610 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4216 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4212 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4211 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4211 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Filed |