Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB423 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 423
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of rural and urban transit districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 458.011, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 458.011.  ADDITIONAL POWERS OF RURAL OR URBAN TRANSIT
 DISTRICT. (a)  A rural or urban transit district may contract with
 any governmental agency or private person, firm, or corporation
 for:
 (1)  the use by either party to the contract of all or
 any part of a facility, structure, interest in land, air right over
 land, or right-of-way that is owned, leased, or held by the other
 party; or
 (2)  the purpose of planning, constructing, or
 operating a facility or performing a service that the rural transit
 district is authorized to operate or perform.
 (b)  The governing body of a rural or urban transit district
 by resolution may adopt rules for the safe and efficient operation
 and maintenance of the transit district's transportation system,
 except that the rules may not relate to Subchapter H, Chapter 411,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *