E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4763
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#294
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
12/17/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|