Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB46 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 46
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensatory time off for certain employees of the
 Parks and Wildlife Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 662.005(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Section 662.010, and
 notwithstanding Section 659.015 or another law, a state employee
 who is a peace officer commissioned by a state officer or state
 agency listed under Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, or
 who is employed by the Department of Public Safety either to perform
 communications or dispatch services related to traffic law
 enforcement or as a public security officer, as that term is defined
 by Section 1701.001, Occupations Code, or who is employed by the
 Parks and Wildlife Department to perform communications and
 dispatch services to assist law enforcement officers commissioned
 by the Parks and Wildlife Commission in performing law enforcement
 duties, and who is required to work on a national or state holiday
 that falls on a Saturday or Sunday is entitled to compensatory time
 off at the rate of one hour for each hour worked on the holiday.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *