Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB460 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White (Senate Sponsor - Ogden) H.B. No. 460
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the board of directors of the Trinity Memorial Hospital
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5(i), Chapter 265, Acts of the 67th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1981, is amended to read as follows:
 (i)  The board shall organize by electing one of its number
 as president and one of its number as vice-president.  A secretary,
 who need not be a director, also shall be elected. Officers shall
 be elected for a term of one year, and a vacancy shall be filled for
 the unexpired term by the board. Any five [four] members of the
 board constitute a quorum, and a concurrence of five [four] is
 sufficient in all matters pertaining to the business of the
 district. All members of the board and officers serve without
 compensation but may be reimbursed for actual expenses incurred in
 the performance of their official duties if those expenses are
 approved by the board and reported in the minute book of the
 district or other records of the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *