Senate | 05/20/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2655 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | RV#294 | Journal Page: 1582 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 12/21/2010 | Filed |