Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB564 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 564
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maintenance of portable fire extinguishers in
 government-owned vehicles in certain local governmental
 jurisdictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Ariel Corley
 Memorial Act.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 370, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 370.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.005.  MUNICIPAL OR COUNTY POLICY REGARDING
 MAINTENANCE OF PORTABLE FIRE EXTINGUISHERS IN GOVERNMENT-OWNED
 VEHICLES. (a)  In this section, "local government" means:
 (1)  a county;
 (2)  a municipality; or
 (3)  an agency, department, or other division of a
 county or municipality.
 (b)  A local government that adopts an ordinance, order, or
 policy requiring motor vehicles owned by the local government to be
 equipped with portable fire extinguishers shall require
 maintenance to be performed on the portable fire extinguishers
 annually in accordance with standards that are at least as
 stringent as the National Fire Protection Association Standard
 Number 10, Portable Fire Extinguishers.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *