House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 01/10/2011 | Filed |