Senate | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1385 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2282 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Record vote | RV#554 | Journal Page: 2281 |
House | 04/27/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2281 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2281 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Amended | 2-Walle | Journal Page: 2239 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2237 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2237 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 412 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |