Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB610 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 610
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 14, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 4, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 4, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain notices sent by the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.128, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and
 (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall encourage the use of electronic
 reporting through the Internet, to the extent practicable, for
 reports required by the commission.  Notwithstanding any other law,
 the commission may[:
 [(1)]  adjust fees as necessary to encourage electronic
 reporting and the use of the commission's electronic document
 receiving system.  An electronic report must be submitted in a
 format prescribed by the commission.  The commission may consult
 with the Department of Information Resources on developing a simple
 format for use in implementing this subsection.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission may[;
 and
 [(2)]  utilize electronic means of transmission of
 information, including notices, orders, and decisions issued or
 sent by the commission.
 (a-2)  The commission shall utilize electronic means of
 transmission for any notice issued or sent by the commission to a
 state senator or representative, unless the senator or
 representative has requested to receive notice by mail.
 (a-3)  If the notice issued or sent under Subsection (a-2)
 concerns a permit for a facility, the notice must include an
 Internet link to an electronic map indicating the location of the
 facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *