Senate | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1673 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#334 | Journal Page: 1673 |
House | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1673 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1673 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |