Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB675 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 675
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to football helmet safety requirements in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.094 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.094.  FOOTBALL HELMET SAFETY REQUIREMENTS. (a) A
 school district may not use a football helmet that is 16 years old
 or older in the district's football program.
 (b)  A school district shall ensure that each football helmet
 used in the district's football program that is 10 years old or
 older is reconditioned at least once every two years.
 (c)  A school district shall maintain and make available to
 parents of students enrolled in the district documentation
 indicating the age of each football helmet used in the district's
 football program and the dates on which each helmet is
 reconditioned.
 (d)  The University Interscholastic League may adopt rules
 necessary to implement this section, provided that the rules must
 be approved by the commissioner in accordance with Section
 33.083(b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2012-2013
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *