Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1078 | Journal Page: 3918 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3918 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3918 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3796 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1040 | Journal Page: 3795 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3795 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 1-Hancock | Journal Page: 3795 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3795 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 01/14/2011 | Filed |