E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6275
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5748
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#805
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/5/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2903
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2903
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
House
|
01/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|