Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB718 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fletcher, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 718
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period in which a person commits the offense of
 funeral service disruption.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.055(b), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A person commits an offense if, during the period
 beginning three hours [one hour] before the service begins and
 ending three hours [one hour] after the service is completed, the
 person engages in picketing within 1,000 feet of a facility or
 cemetery being used for a funeral service.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *