House | 04/19/2011 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 1975 |
House | 04/19/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1974 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Postponed | 4/19/11 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 1935 |
House | 04/19/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 1935 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Postponed | 4/19/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1831 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 547 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 458 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 458 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Filed |