Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 826 | |
2 | 2 | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011; | |
3 | 3 | May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on | |
4 | 4 | Education; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: | |
5 | 5 | Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.) | |
6 | 6 | ||
7 | 7 | ||
8 | 8 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
9 | 9 | AN ACT | |
10 | 10 | relating to facilitating the enrollment in or transfer to a public | |
11 | 11 | school district of a student in the conservatorship of the state. | |
12 | 12 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
13 | 13 | SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is | |
14 | 14 | amended by adding Section 33.904 to read as follows: | |
15 | 15 | Sec. 33.904. LIAISON FOR CERTAIN CHILDREN IN | |
16 | 16 | CONSERVATORSHIP OF STATE. Each school district shall appoint at | |
17 | 17 | least one employee to act as a liaison officer to facilitate the | |
18 | 18 | enrollment in or transfer to a public school of a child in the | |
19 | 19 | district who is in the conservatorship of the state. | |
20 | 20 | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2011, each school | |
21 | 21 | district shall appoint the liaison officer required under Section | |
22 | 22 | 33.904, Education Code, as added by this Act. | |
23 | 23 | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. | |
24 | 24 | * * * * * |