Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB826 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 826
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to facilitating the enrollment in or transfer to a public
 school district of a student in the conservatorship of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.904 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.904.  LIAISON FOR CERTAIN CHILDREN IN
 CONSERVATORSHIP OF STATE. Each school district shall appoint at
 least one employee to act as a liaison officer to facilitate the
 enrollment in or transfer to a public school of a child in the
 district who is in the conservatorship of the state.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, each school
 district shall appoint the liaison officer required under Section
 33.904, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *