Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB885 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 885
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 31, 2011;
 April 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 9, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation and movement of a vehicle when certain
 traffic-control signals do not display an indication.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 544.007, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
 follows:
 (i)  An operator of a vehicle facing a traffic-control
 signal, other than a freeway entrance ramp control signal or a
 pedestrian hybrid beacon, that does not display an indication in
 any of the signal heads shall stop as provided by Section 544.010 as
 if the intersection had a stop sign.
 (j)  In this section:
 (1)  "Freeway entrance ramp control signal" means a
 traffic-control signal that controls the flow of traffic entering a
 freeway.
 (2)  "Pedestrian hybrid beacon" means a
 pedestrian-controlled traffic-control signal that displays
 different colored lights successively only when activated by a
 pedestrian.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *