E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4219
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#281
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 509
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 509
|
House
|
01/26/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|