House | 05/03/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2696 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 396 | Journal Page: 2695 |
House | 04/27/2011 | Postponed | 5/3/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2293 |
House | 04/27/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2292 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Postponed | 4/27/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2159 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2158 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |