E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5394
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1075
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1039
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
01/27/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|