1 | 1 | | By: Callegari, Creighton (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 965 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Natural Resources; May 4, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 4, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to continuing education requirements for persons holding |
---|
11 | 11 | | licenses issued by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 37.008, Water Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as |
---|
15 | 15 | | follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (c) The commission may recognize, prepare, or administer |
---|
17 | 17 | | continuing education programs for license holders, including |
---|
18 | 18 | | continuing education programs made available through the Internet. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (d) The commission by rule shall provide a method for a |
---|
20 | 20 | | person who holds a license prescribed by Section 26.0301 of this |
---|
21 | 21 | | code or Section 341.033 or 341.034, Health and Safety Code, to |
---|
22 | 22 | | certify at the time the license is renewed that the license holder |
---|
23 | 23 | | has complied with the commission's continuing education |
---|
24 | 24 | | requirements. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2011, the Texas |
---|
26 | 26 | | Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules implementing |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 37.008(d), Water Code, as added by this Act. The rules must |
---|
28 | 28 | | provide a method by which the holder of a Class A or Class B public |
---|
29 | 29 | | water system operator or domestic wastewater treatment facility |
---|
30 | 30 | | operator license may certify the holder's compliance with |
---|
31 | 31 | | continuing education requirements. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
33 | 33 | | * * * * * |
---|