Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB965 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Callegari, Creighton (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 965
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 4, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 4, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuing education requirements for persons holding
 licenses issued by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.008, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  The commission may recognize, prepare, or administer
 continuing education programs for license holders, including
 continuing education programs made available through the Internet.
 (d)  The commission by rule shall provide a method for a
 person who holds a license prescribed by Section 26.0301 of this
 code or Section 341.033 or 341.034, Health and Safety Code, to
 certify at the time the license is renewed that the license holder
 has complied with the commission's continuing education
 requirements.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules implementing
 Section 37.008(d), Water Code, as added by this Act. The rules must
 provide a method by which the holder of a Class A or Class B public
 water system operator or domestic wastewater treatment facility
 operator license may certify the holder's compliance with
 continuing education requirements.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *