Senate | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1277 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1277 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1139 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1845 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Record vote | RV#390 | Journal Page: 1844 |
House | 04/15/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1844 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1844 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1546 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |