E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1139
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
01/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|