E | 05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3527 | |
E | 04/29/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2658 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1386 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2260 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2095 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2095 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1759 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Filed |