E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4013 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5957 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5964 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5389 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3330 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3330 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3330 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3330 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2710 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2305 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3867 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3201 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Filed |