E | 05/27/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
E | 05/16/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4125 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3826 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3830 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3524 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Filed |