H.C.R. No. 131 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, Howard Victor Reed of Austin passed away on March 5, 2011, at the age of 87, leaving his circle of family and friends with many treasured memories of time spent in his company; and WHEREAS, Born on April 5, 1923, in Brownsville, Howard Reed was the son of Captain Wallace L. Reed and Ada Egly Reed, and he enjoyed the companionship of one sister and five brothers; he served with the U.S. Naval Air Corps during World War II until the deaths of two of his brothers in the armed forces led to his honorable discharge and return home as head of the household; and WHEREAS, At the age of 21, Howard Reed sought his fortune in Mexico, where he made the acquaintance of oilman Clint Murchison, Sr.; the pair became joint investors in land and cattle ventures and longtime business partners, as well as close personal friends; and WHEREAS, A Renaissance man who maintained an avid interest in ranching throughout his life, Mr. Reed was as comfortable in a tuxedo as in boots and a cowboy hat; he supported countless philanthropic endeavors as an anonymous donor, wanting no fanfare, and he was deeply admired for his kindness, optimism, and honesty; in addition, his outstanding abilities as a storyteller were a continual source of delight; and WHEREAS, Howard Reed exchanged vows with the former Cecelia "Cis" Fernandez on January 1, 1949, and the couple shared 62 rewarding years of marriage; they became the parents of five children, Leigh, Victoria, Howard, Carol, and Forrest, and they watched with pride as their family grew to include six grandchildren; and WHEREAS, Howard Reed made an indelible impression on all who were privileged to share in his love and friendship, and they will forever carry him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 82nd Legislature of the State of Texas hereby pay tribute to the life of Howard Victor Reed and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Cecelia Reed; to his children, Leigh Moore and her husband, Bobby, Victoria Reed-Fenimore and her husband, Chet Fenimore, Howard Victor Reed, Jr., and his wife, Kelli, Carol Reed, and Forrest Reed; to his grandchildren, Courtney and Garrett Bramlett and Mary, Harrison, Trace, and Clint Reed; to his brother, Roy Reed, and his wife, JoAnne; to his sister, Sunshine Reed VanHolsbeke, and her husband, Leon; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Howard Reed. J. Davis of Harris ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 131 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on April 21, 2011. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 131 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the Senate on May 10, 2011. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor