House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3393 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Filed |