Senate | 05/23/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2980 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1185 | Journal Page: 4367 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4367 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4341 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Filed |