E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/30/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
Senate | 05/29/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5042 | |
House | 05/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6455 | |
House | 05/28/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6874 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6277 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4041 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4041 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 4041 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4039 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5421 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1405 | Journal Page: 5422 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5422 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5416 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5399 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Filed |