E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/30/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
Senate | 05/29/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5117 | |
House | 05/29/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6869 | |
House | 05/29/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6916 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6277 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4084 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Adopted | HB 2203 | Journal Page: 4084 |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 4084 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4083 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1403 | Journal Page: 5405 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Adopted | HB 2203 | Journal Page: 5405 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5405 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Filed |