House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 415 | |
House | 01/04/2011 | Filed |