E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/23/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5399 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4766 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4224 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1142 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#375 | Journal Page: 1801 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1801 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Filed |