E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/31/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
Senate | 05/31/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5148 | |
House | 05/31/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6913 | |
House | 05/31/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6916 | |
House | 05/30/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6914 | |
Senate | 05/30/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5138 | |
Senate | 05/30/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5138 | |
Senate | 05/30/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 5138 | |
Senate | 05/30/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5138 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2634 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4216 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4211 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |