House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |