Senate | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4152 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Record vote | RV#1153 | Journal Page: 4151 |
House | 05/18/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4151 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4151 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |