House | 05/13/2011 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3873 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3872 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1048 | Journal Page: 3872 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 3872 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3872 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3781 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3780 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1035 | Journal Page: 3780 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3780 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4) | Journal Page: 3779 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3778 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 3:15 PM | Journal Page: 3715 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 3715 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 3-Phillips | Journal Page: 3714 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 3714 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3639 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#981 | Journal Page: 3638 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment to amendment tabled | 2-Hochberg | Journal Page: 3638 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 3638 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3638 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3589 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1067 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1067 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |