Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR138 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R25006 ACP-D
 By: Ritter H.J.R. No. 138
 Substitute the following for H.J.R. No. 138:
 By:  Hopson C.S.H.J.R. No. 138


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation and
 funding of the state water implementation fund for Texas to assist
 the Texas Water Development Board in the funding of certain
 projects included in the state water plan.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-12 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-12.  (a) The state water implementation fund for
 Texas is created in the state treasury to provide a method for
 financing projects included in a statewide water plan that is
 required by general law and adopted by the Texas Water Development
 Board or its successor in function.
 (b)  Money deposited to the credit of the state water
 implementation fund for Texas and interest earned on the investment
 of money credited to the fund shall be administered, without
 further appropriation, by the Texas Water Development Board or its
 successor in function and used only to fund projects included in a
 statewide water plan that is required by general law and adopted by
 the Texas Water Development Board or its successor in function.
 (c)  The legislature by general law:
 (1)  may provide for the imposition by this state of a
 fee or tax the proceeds of which shall be deposited to the credit of
 the state water implementation fund for Texas and may provide for
 the deposit of other sources of revenue to the credit of the fund;
 and
 (2)  shall prescribe the manner in which money in the
 fund may be used.
 (d)  This subsection expires September 1, 2027. The
 legislature by general law shall provide for the imposition of a
 public water supply service connection fee to be collected by a
 water utility from the utility's customers. The legislature by
 general law may provide for exemptions from the fee.  A fee
 collected under this subsection shall be deposited to the credit of
 the state water implementation fund for Texas. The comptroller of
 public accounts by rule shall establish the rate of the fee, which
 may not exceed:
 (1)  $1 each month, if the connection is for a
 residential use;
 (2)  $5 each month, if the connection is for a
 commercial use; or
 (3)  $100 each month, if the connection is for an
 industrial use.
 (e)  A general law enacted under this section dedicating
 revenue to the state water implementation fund for Texas prevails
 over any Act enacted in the same session of the legislature that
 purports to abolish dedications of revenue in the state treasury
 for a particular purpose, regardless of the relative dates of
 enactment.
 (f)  If the system benefit fund created under Section 39.903,
 Utilities Code, or its successor in function exists on September 1,
 2014, the comptroller of public accounts shall transfer from that
 fund or its successor in function the lesser of $500 million or the
 amount available in that fund or its successor in function to the
 state water implementation fund for Texas on that date. This
 subsection expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to
 the constitutional amendment proposed by the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, providing for the creation and funding of
 the state water implementation fund for Texas to assist the Texas
 Water Development Board in the funding of certain projects included
 in the state water plan.
 (b)  A general law enacted in anticipation of the adoption of
 the amendment is not void due to the law's anticipatory character.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 creation and funding of the state water implementation fund for
 Texas to assist the Texas Water Development Board in the funding of
 certain projects included in the state water plan."