House | 05/03/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1777 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1637 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Filed |