LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2011 - 82nd Regular
House
Bills
HR1747
Action History
TX
Texas House Bill HR1747
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR1747
Action History
05/19/2011
Reported enrolled
05/12/2011
Adopted
05/12/2011
Laid before the House
05/12/2011
Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
05/10/2011
Considered in Rules and Resolutions
05/05/2011
Referred to Rules & Resolutions
05/04/2011
Filed